EP2929041 - OMEGA-3 PENTAENOIC ACID COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matinas Biopharma, Inc. 1545 Route 206, Suite 302 Bedminster, New Jersey 07921 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states Matinas Biopharma, Inc. 1545 Route 206 Suite 302 Bedminster, New Jersey 07921 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOBOTAS, George 1245 N. Florida Ave. Tarpon Springs, Florida 34689 / US | 02 /
FAWZY, Abdel Aziz 12525 Colony Preserve Drive Boynton Beach, Florida 33436 / US | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13861394.8 | 06.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US73701 | Priority number, date | US201261734331P | 06.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261734331 P | US201361780948P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361780948 P | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014089501 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929041 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/225, A61K31/40, A61K31/202, A61K9/48, A23D9/00, A23D9/06, C11B5/00 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
A23D9/06 (EP,KR);
A61K31/202 (EP,CN,KR);
A23D9/00 (EP);
A61K31/40 (CN);
A61K9/4825 (EP);
A61K9/4858 (EP);
A61K9/4875 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (CN) |
Former IPC [2015/42] | C12P7/64, A23D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | OMEGA-3-PENTAENSÄURE-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2015/42] | English: | OMEGA-3 PENTAENOIC ACID COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2015/42] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ACIDE PENTAÉNOÏQUE D'OMÉGA-3 ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉES | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 05.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/47] | Divisional application(s) | EP21170003.4 / EP3888646 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1714564 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO2008032949 (ILSHIN WELLS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [I]US2011071090 (DRISCOLL DAVID F [US]) [I] 1-15 * claim 6 * * table 4 *; | [E]WO2013192109 (MATINAS BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * claim 1 ** example 3 * | International search | [X]US2010069492 (GEIRINGEN KARL THOMAS [NZ], et al); | [Y]WO2010147994 (OSTERLOH IAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012112531 (PIVOTAL THERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) |