EP2933489 - COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Appliances Refrigeration Devices Singapore 1 Bedok South Road Singapore 469267 / SG | [2018/50] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUTAGAMI, Yoshiyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Yoshinori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
FUKUHARA, Hiroyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KAWABARTA, Hirotaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
YAMAOKA, Masakazu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13861548.9 | 11.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013JP07277 | Priority number, date | JP20120269989 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012269989 | JP20120269990 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012269990 | JP20120269991 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012269991 | JP20120269995 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012269995 | JP20130230936 | 07.11.2013 Original published format: JP 2013230936 | JP20130230937 | 07.11.2013 Original published format: JP 2013230937 | JP20130231874 | 08.11.2013 Original published format: JP 2013231874 | [2015/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014091752 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933489 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/10, F04B39/02, F04C29/12, F04C18/02, F16K15/16 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
F04B39/1066 (EP,US);
C10M103/02 (EP,US);
C10M103/06 (EP,US);
C10M107/38 (EP,US);
F04B35/04 (US);
F04B39/0276 (EP,US);
F04B39/0292 (US);
F04B39/1073 (EP,US);
F04C29/128 (EP,US);
F16K15/16 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0413 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0623 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0663 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0623 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2050/023 (EP,US);
C10N2050/14 (EP,US);
F04C18/0207 (EP,US);
F04C2230/91 (EP,US);
F05C2251/14 (EP,US);
F05C2253/12 (EP,US);
F05C2253/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2201/0623, C10N2010/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | F04B39/10, F16K15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | VERDICHTER | [2015/43] | English: | COMPRESSOR | [2015/43] | French: | COMPRESSEUR | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2015 | Translation filed | 13.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 25.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH09280167 (SANDEN CORP); | [Y]JP2008002387 (TOSHIBA CARRIER KK); | [A]JP2008215290 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2000045949 | - JSME ANNUAL MEETING, (2005), vol. 5-1, page 143 |