EP2932032 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REAL-TIME SAG DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMISON, Dale E. 3000 N. Sam Houston Pkwy. E Houston, Texas 77032 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13862618.9 | 11.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US74274 | Priority number, date | US201213713447 | 13.12.2012 Original published format: US201213713447 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093432 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932032 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2932032 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B21/08, E21B44/00, G01N15/04 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
G01N15/04 (EP,US);
E21B47/092 (US);
E21B21/08 (EP,US);
E21B44/00 (EP,US);
E21B49/005 (US);
G01N9/26 (EP,US);
G01N9/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | E21B47/02, E21B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON SENKUNG IN ECHTZEIT | [2015/43] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REAL-TIME SAG DETECTION | [2015/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION D'AFFAISSEMENT EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 06.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2013 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | IT | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IE | 11.12.2019 | LU | 11.12.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.12.2013 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6176323 (WEIRICH JOHN B [US], et al); | [A]US2003084717 (HERZHAFT BENJAMIN [FR], et al); | [A]US6584833 (JAMISON DALE E [US], et al); | [A]US2011167901 (JAMISON DALE E [US], et al); | [A] - BERN , P.A. ET AL., "Field Monitoring of Weight-Material Sag", AADE CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, (20100406), pages 1 - 11, XP055260334 | by applicant | US6176323 |