Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9920682 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2018 | B2 | US2016017789 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012272190 | 13.12.2012 | WO2013JP06953 | 27.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2933465 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2020 | B1 | EP2933465 | 16.11.2016 | A4 | EP2933465 | 21.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012272190 | 13.12.2012 | WO2013JP06953 | 27.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014091695 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012272190 | 13.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6082242B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2017 | B2 | JP2014118828 | 30.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012272190 | 13.12.2012 |