EP2929421 - DISPLAYING WINDOWS ON A TOUCHSCREEN DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUHNE, Stefan C/o Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theatinerstraße 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13863364.9 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US73189 | Priority number, date | US201213710397 | 10.12.2012 Original published format: US201213710397 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093105 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929421 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/041, G06F3/14, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | G06F3/048, G06F3/041, G06F3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | ANZEIGE VON FENSTERN AUF EINER BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG | [2015/42] | English: | DISPLAYING WINDOWS ON A TOUCHSCREEN DEVICE | [2015/42] | French: | AFFICHAGE DE FENÊTRES SUR UN DISPOSITIF À ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 12.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010313165 (LOUCH JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 6] , [0 28] , [0 29] , [0 31] , [0 65] , [0 72]; figures 1A, 1B, 1D *; | [A]US2011244924 (JUNG JONG CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-5,7-12,14,15* paragraphs [0203] , [ 204]; figures 14c, 14d *; | [Y]WO2011135894 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * figures 4A, 4B *; | [Y]US2012246596 (ORDING BAS [US], et al) [Y] 6,13 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 48]; figure 2B *; | [P]EP2565763 (NEC CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0012] , [0 19] , [0 26] - [0029]; figures 4A, 4B * | International search | [Y]KR20100131724 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2011244924 (JUNG JONG CHEOL [KR], et al); | [A]US2011300910 (CHOI KYUNGDONG [KR]); | [Y]US2012154447 (KIM TAEHUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2012162358 (CHOI KYUNGDONG [KR]) |