EP2928577 - ULTRAPOROUS NANOFIBER MATS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/42] | ULTRPOROUS NANOFIBER MATS AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2023/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 400 Summit Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2018/38] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOZLOV, Mikhail c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 02 /
TKACIK, Gabriel c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 03 /
KAS, Onur, Y. c/o EmdMillipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 04 /
POTTY, Ajish c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 05 /
PATEL, Jigneshkumar c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2023/27] |
Former [2015/42] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13863417.5 | 10.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US74132 | Priority number, date | US201261735275P | 10.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261735275 P | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093345 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928577 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928577 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/14, B01D39/16, B01D67/00, B01D71/56, B01D69/06, A61L2/02 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B01D71/56 (EP,US);
A61L2/022 (EP,US);
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D67/00042 (EP,US);
B01D2239/025 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0631 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0654 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2323/39 (EP,US);
B01D2325/0281 (EP);
B01D2325/02832 (EP);
B01D69/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/33] | B01D39/14, B01D39/08, B01D69/06, A61L2/02 | ||
Former IPC [2015/42] | B01D39/14, B01D39/08, B01D69/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAPORÖSE NANOFASERMATTEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2015/42] | English: | ULTRAPOROUS NANOFIBER MATS AND USES THEREOF | [2023/08] | French: | MATS DE NANOFIBRES ULTRAPOREUX ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2015/42] |
Former [2015/42] | ULTRPOROUS NANOFIBER MATS AND USES THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 03.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2020 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | LU | 10.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SI | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006016748 (KOGUMA ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [XY]US2011198282 (CHU BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [Y]US2012061332 (KAS ONUR Y [US], et al); | [XI]US2012125847 (SEHGAL LAKSHMAN R [US]) | International search | [A]US2008164214 (LERNER MARAT IZRAILIEVICH [RU], et al); | [A]US2008264259 (LEUNG WALLACE W [HK]); | [A]US2011198282 (CHU BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [A]US2012061332 (KAS ONUR Y [US], et al); | [A]US2012091072 (KOZLOV MIKHAIL [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2005024101 | US2006016748 | WO2006131081 | WO2008106903 | WO2010107503 | US2012061332 | US2012125847 |