EP2932039 - FAN WITH INTEGRAL SHROUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUCIU, Gabriel, L. 27 Tanglewood Drive Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
CHANDLER, Jesse, M. 90 Overlook Rd South Windsor, Connecticut 06074 / US | 03 /
MERRY, Brian, D. 220 Bear Swamp Road Andover, Connecticut 06232 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13863829.1 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US72993 | Priority number, date | US201213716959 | 17.12.2012 Original published format: US201213716959 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014099365 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932039 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/22, F01D5/34, B23P15/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F01D21/045 (EP,US);
F01D5/34 (EP,US);
F04D29/023 (EP,US);
F04D29/321 (EP,US);
F05D2220/36 (EP,US);
F05D2230/53 (EP,US);
F05D2260/96 (EP,US);
F05D2300/121 (EP,US);
F05D2300/133 (EP,US);
F05D2300/173 (EP,US);
F05D2300/174 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | F01D5/02, F01D5/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | LÜFTER MIT INTEGRIERTEM MANTEL | [2015/43] | English: | FAN WITH INTEGRAL SHROUD | [2015/43] | French: | VENTILATEUR À TUYÈRE INTÉGRÉE | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 21.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2952442 (WARNKEN ELMER P) [Y] 1-15* figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US3556675 (HOWALD WERNER E, et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]US5201850 (LENHARDT CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 9-12; | [X]US6223524 (DURCAN JAMES FRANCIS [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-10,12-15 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-7 * * column 10, line 9 - line 44 *; | [X]US6454535 (GOSHORN DAVID ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * column 4; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005220621 (HORNICK DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2006062451 (VOLVO AERO CORP [SE], et al) [X] 1,5-10,13-15 * page 7, line 19 - line 39; figures 1-8; claims 19-26 *; | [X]US2008016688 (FABRE ADRIEN [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] - [0043]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE102010021220 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0024] , [0034] , [0038]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]CN102418562 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-15 * figure 5; claims 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US4464094 (GERKEN JOHN M [US]); | [A]US5599165 (ELAINI YEHIA [US], et al); | [A]US8105039 (EL-AINI YEHIA M [US], et al); | [Y]US8206086 (JOHNSON PAUL D [US], et al); | [A]WO2012091821 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) |