EP2934305 - SYSTEM FOR MULTI-SITE INTRAVASCULAR MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/44] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MULTI-SITE INTRAVASCULAR MEASUREMENT | ||
[2017/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volcano Corporation 3661 Valley Centre Dr., Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLET, Bret 1065 Brock Circle Folsom, California 95630 / US | 02 /
BURNETT, Joe 3192 Sitio Sendero Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/08] |
Former [2015/44] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13864320.0 | 17.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US75702 | Priority number, date | US201261745491P | 21.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261745491 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014099935 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934305 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2934305 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B8/08, A61B5/00, A61B8/12, A61B8/00, A61B5/0205, A61B5/026, A61B5/107 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B5/0035 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/026 (EP,US);
A61B8/0833 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/4416 (EP,US);
A61B8/565 (EP,US);
A61B5/1076 (EP,US);
A61B5/7435 (EP,US);
A61B8/0891 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/465 (EP,US);
A61B8/488 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | A61B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR INTRAVASKULÄRE MESSUNG AN MEHREREN STELLEN | [2017/32] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MULTI-SITE INTRAVASCULAR MEASUREMENT | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE INTRAVASCULAIRE MULTISITE | [2017/32] |
Former [2015/44] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR INTRAVASKULÄRE MESSUNG AN MEHREREN STELLEN | ||
Former [2015/44] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MULTI-SITE INTRAVASCULAR MEASUREMENT | ||
Former [2015/44] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE INTRAVASCULAIRE MULTISITE | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 02.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2013 | AL | 21.02.2018 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | ES | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | RS | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.12.2013 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006235314 (MIGLIUOLO MICHELE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,14 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108]; figures 18-20; claim - * [I] 5,6; | [XI]US2010168836 (KASSAB GHASSAN S [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10-14 * paragraphs [0070] - [0075] - [0086] - [0094] - [0104] , [0109] , [0114] , [0120]; figure -; claim - * [I] 5-9; | [XI]US2010087782 (GHAFFARI ROOZBEH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9-14 * paragraphs [0027] , [0047] - [0058]; figure -; claim - * [I] 3,5,6,8; | [X]US2012172731 (SMITH LEIF [SE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] - [0048] , [0059] - [0060] - [0076]; figure -; claim - *; | [XI]US2010113939 (MASHIMO HIROSHI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-9,14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] , [0031] - [0037]; figure -; claim - * [I] 5,6,10-13; | [XI]US5178153 (EINZIG ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 6, line 45 - column 12, line 31 * * column 18, line 38 - column 24, line 10 * [I] 5,6 | International search | [X]US5873835 (HASTINGS ROGER N [US], et al); | [A]US6755789 (STRINGER BRADLEY J [US], et al); | [A]US6612992 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US6592520 (PESZYNSKI MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US7930014 (HUENNEKENS R SCOTT [US], et al) |