EP2937359 - CHROMATOGRAPHIC METHOD FOR ISOLATING AND PURIFYING HIGH-PURITY RECOMBINED HUMAN SERUM ALBUMIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WUHAN HEALTHGEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP No.666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Daichang 666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Bo 666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | 03 /
SHI, Qianni 666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | 04 /
OU, Jiquan 666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Jingru 666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/24] |
Former [2015/44] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 13864364.8 | 09.05.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013CN75405 | Priority number, date | CN201210559390 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: CN201210559390 | [2015/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014094406 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937359 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937359 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/18, C07K14/765 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/765 (EP,CN,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHROMATOGRAFISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG UND REINIGUNG VON HOCHREINEM REKOMBINANTEN MENSCHLICHEN SERUMALBUMIN | [2015/44] | English: | CHROMATOGRAPHIC METHOD FOR ISOLATING AND PURIFYING HIGH-PURITY RECOMBINED HUMAN SERUM ALBUMIN | [2015/44] | French: | MÉTHODE CHROMATOGRAPHIQUE D'ISOLEMENT ET DE PURIFICATION DE SÉRUMALBUMINE HUMAINE RECOMBINÉE DE PURETÉ ÉLEVÉE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2015 | Translation filed | 25.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 25.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 17.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18174112.5 / EP3398964 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2013 | AL | 13.06.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | MK | 13.06.2018 | MT | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | RS | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | SM | 13.06.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | PT | 15.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
MT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.05.2013 | |
AL | 13.06.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
PT | 15.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.06.2018 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
SM | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
RS | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 13.06.2018 | |
NO | 13.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5917022 (DAVIES JEFFREY RAYMOND [AU]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005003152 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101260145 (BEIJING WEIMING FUYUAN GENE PH [CN]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2012083580 (HEALTHGEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * * page 13, lines 1-3; example 7; claim - *; | [Y] - LIN M F ET AL, "Removal of lipopolysaccharides from protein-lipopolysaccharide complexes by nonflammable solvents", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 816, no. 1-2, ISSN 1570-0232, (20050225), pages 167 - 174, (20050225), XP027626884 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - BURNOUF T ET AL, "Affinity chromatography in the industrial purification of plasma proteins for therapeutic use", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011030), vol. 49, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0165-022X(01)00221-4, ISSN 0165-022X, pages 575 - 586, XP002353092 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * * page 580 - page 581 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-022X(01)00221-4 | [A] - BELEW M ET AL, "Purification of Recombinant Human Serum Albumin (rHSA) Produced by Genetically Modified Pichia Pastoris", SEPARATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 43, no. 13, doi:10.1080/01496390802221857, ISSN 0149-6395, (20080831), pages 3134 - 3153, (20080801), XP008169071 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01496390802221857 | International search | [A]WO9015617 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]); | [A]CN101665798 (ZHEJIANG DEQING ANPING BIOLOGY); | [A]CN102127164 (WUHAN HEALTHGEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN102190722 (SHANGHAI ANRUITE BIOMEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [X]CN102532254 (WUHAN HEALTHGEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | by applicant | EP0683233 | US5612196 | WO0044772 | - LATTA, M. ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, pages 1309 - 1314 | - SAUNDERS, C. W. ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 2917 - 2925 | CN20051019084 |