EP2934474 - MODULATION OF MELANOGENESIS BY MODIFICATION OF TYROSINASE BY PALMITOYLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELC Management LLC 155 Pinelawn Road, Suite 345 South Melville, NY 11747 / US | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAROSH, Daniel B. 2915 Shore Drive Merrick, New York 11566 / US | 02 /
DECLERCQ, Lieve Stadhouderslaan 2 B-2180 Ekeren / BE | 03 /
NIKI, Yoko 1192-374 Shinzaike Hiraoka-cho Kakogawa Hyogo 675-0101 / JP | 04 /
SAITO, Naoaki 349-1 Awazu Kakogawa-cho Kakogawa Hyogo 675-0039 / JP | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13864592.4 | 12.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US74666 | Priority number, date | US201261740048P | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740048 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014099609 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934474 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/36, A61K8/64, A61Q5/08, A61Q5/10, A61Q19/02, A61K31/20, A61K38/00, A61K38/06, A61K38/08 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/66 (US);
A61K31/20 (EP,US);
A61K38/005 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K8/361 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | A61K8/64, A61Q19/02, A61Q5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | MELANOGENESEMODULATION DURCH TYROSINASEMODIFIZIERUNG MITTELS PALMITOYLATION | [2015/44] | English: | MODULATION OF MELANOGENESIS BY MODIFICATION OF TYROSINASE BY PALMITOYLATION | [2015/44] | French: | MODULATION DE MÉLANOGENÈSE PAR MODIFICATION DE TYROSINASE PAR PALMITOYLATION | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 15.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | EP17166331.3 / EP3207919 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6890954 (RESH MARILYN D [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * claim 1 *; | [XY]US2011044920 (HINES MICHELLE [US], et al) [X] 3,4,6-8,10,13,14,16,17,19,20 * paragraph [0027] * * tables 11,13 *[Y] 3-10,13-20; | [A]US2011183914 (OSBORNE ROSEMARIE [US]) [A] 1,2,11,12 * paragraph [0387] * * claims 1,3,8 *; | [YA]US2012156315 (KIM YOUNG CHUL [KR], et al) [Y] 1,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] * [A] 2,12; | [YDA] - ANAND K. GANESAN ET AL, "Genome-Wide siRNA-Based Functional Genomics of Pigmentation Identifies Novel Genes and Pathways That Impact Melanogenesis in Human Cells", PLOS GENETICS, (20081205), vol. 4, no. 12, doi:10.1371/journal.pgen.1000298, page e1000298, XP055110458 [YD] 1,11 * figures 1a-c * * table 2 * [A] 2,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1000298 | [Y] - DRAPER JEREMIAH M ET AL, "Palmitoyl acyltransferase assays and inhibitors (Review)", MOLECULAR MEMBRANE BIOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS, GB, (20090101), vol. 26, no. 1-2, doi:10.1080/09687680802683839, ISSN 0968-7688, pages 5 - 13, XP009135881 [Y] 1,11 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09687680802683839 | [XY] - ANONYMOUS, "Skin brightening daily moisturiser SPF 30", GNPD, MINTEL, (20060131), Database accession no. 427648, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP002761076 [X] 3-5,7-9,13-15,17,18,20 * pages 1,2 * [Y] 3-10,13-20 | [XY] - ANONYMOUS, "Radiant night peel 15% - intensive skin renewal treatment", GNPD, MINTEL, (20121130), Database accession no. 1857082, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP002761077 [X] 3,4,6-8,10,13,14,16,17,19,20 * pages 1,4 * [Y] 3-10,13-20 | International search | [X]US2010183527 (MOSER PHILIPPE [FR], et al); | [X]US2012021029 (GARCIA SANZ NURIA [ES], et al); | [A] - MENG, LIHAO ET AL., "The antiproliferative agent Didemnin B uncompetitively inhibits palmitoyl protein thioesterase", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, no. 2 9, pages 10488 - 10492, XP055268129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi9804479 | [A] - CHO, SEONGEUN ET AL., "Antisense palmitoyl protein thioesterase 1 (PPT1) tre atment inhibits PPT1 activity and increases cell death in LA-N-5 neuroblasto ma cells", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (20001015), vol. 62, pages 234 - 240, XP055269098 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4547(20001015)62:2<234::AID-JNR8>3.0.CO;2-8 | [XP] - NIKI, Y. ET AL., "Pigment Cell & Melanoma Research", THE 25TH ANNUAL MEET ING OF THE JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR PIGMENT CELL RESEARCH. ''REGULATION OF MELANI N SYNTHESIS BY INLINE IMAGESINLINE IMAGE -PALMITOYLATION OF TYROSINASE, vol. 26, no. 6, pages E10 - 31, XP008180051 |