EP2936316 - SYSTEMS AND APPARATUSES FOR AGGREGATING NODES TO FORM AN AGGREGATED VIRTUAL STORAGE FOR A VIRTUALIZED DESKTOP ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlantis Computing, Inc. 2525 East Charleston Road Suite 100 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATESH, Chetan, C 306 Rosilie Street San Mateo 94403 / US | 02 /
IYER, Kartikeya 2750 W. El Camino Real Suite 230 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Nguyen-Van-Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Nguyen Van Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13865153.4 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US76683 | Priority number, date | US201213725939 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: US201213725939 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014100472 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2936316 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00, H04L29/08, G06F3/06, G06F11/20 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
G06F3/0608 (EP,US);
G06F3/0614 (EP,US);
G06F3/0641 (EP,US);
G06F3/065 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
G06F11/2094 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR KNOTENAGGREGATION ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AGGREGIERTEN VIRTUELLEN SPEICHERS FÜR EINE VIRTUALISIERTE DESKTOPUMGEBUNG | [2015/44] | English: | SYSTEMS AND APPARATUSES FOR AGGREGATING NODES TO FORM AN AGGREGATED VIRTUAL STORAGE FOR A VIRTUALIZED DESKTOP ENVIRONMENT | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET APPAREILS D'AGRÉGATION DE NOEUDS POUR FORMER UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE VIRTUEL AGRÉGÉ POUR UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE BUREAU VIRTUALISÉ | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 25.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007156842 (VERMEULEN ALLAN H [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7-12,15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraphs [0063] , [0071] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraphs [0117] , [0123] , [0124] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraphs [0147] , [0186]; figure 2 * [I] 2,3,5,6,13,14; | [XI]US2010312749 (BRAHMADESAM MURALI [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0019] , [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figures 2-4 * [I] 2,3,5,6,10-12 | International search | [A]US2006112251 (KARR ET AL.) | [A]US2012254131 (AI KISWANY) | [A]US2005114595 (KARR ET AL.) | [A]US2011055471 (THATCHER ET AL.) | [A]US2010070725 (PRAHLAD ET AL.) | [A]US2011035620 (ELYASHEV) |