EP2934526 - ANTIMICROBIAL BISPYRIDINE AMINE COMPOSITIONS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONZA, LLC 412 Mt. Kemble Avenue, Suite 200S Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2020/26] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Lonza Inc. 90 Boroline Road Allendale, NJ 07401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUBER, James V. 56 New Hampton Road Washington, New Jersey 07882 / US | 02 /
CICCOGNANI, Diana 5345 Avonshire Lane Cumming, Georgia 30040 / US | 03 /
PASHOVYCH, Volodymyr B 11006 Summerwood Lane Alpharetta, Georgia 30005 / US | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Greiner, Elisabeth df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13866270.5 | 23.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US77428 | Priority number, date | US201261740512P | 21.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740512 P | US201361752707P | 15.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361752707 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014100807 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934526 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4425, A61K8/36, C11D3/48, A61K8/49, A61Q15/00, A61Q17/00, A61P31/00, A61P17/02 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
A61K31/4425 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | A61K31/4425 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE BISPYRIDINAMINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2015/44] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL BISPYRIDINE AMINE COMPOSITIONS AND USES | [2015/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'AMINE BIS-PYRIDINE ANTIMICROBIENNES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 02.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.02.2021 | 12.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004092588 (KRAMER AXEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] * * example 1 * * claim 3 *; | [ID]US4206215 (BAILEY DENIS M [US]) [ID] 1-15 * column 2, line 10 - column 2, line 20 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 24 *; | [A]EP1683416 (AIR LIQUIDE SANTE INT [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2011003857 (BEILFUSS WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009106468 (AIR LIQUIDE SANTE INT [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012031984 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2006165612 (BEILFUSS WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [A]US5370875 (ROGOZINSKI WALLACE J [US]); | [A]US2007255004 (LOHRMANN MARC [DE], et al); | [A]US2011091551 (BAUR BORIS [DE], et al) |