EP2939660 - MICROGRANULAR FORMULATION INCLUDING AGGLOMERATE UNITS COMPRISING DISCONTINUOUS PHASE AND CONTINUOUS PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/45] | MICROGRANULAR FORMULATION INCLUDING COAGULATION UNIT COMPRISING DISCONTINUOUS PHASE AND CONTINUOUS PHASE | ||
[2024/18] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CorePharm Co., Ltd. 5F, Garosu Bldg., 103, Bokjeong-ro Sujeong-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | For all designated states CorePharmbio Co., Ltd. 5F, Garosu Bldg., 103, Bokjeong-ro Sujeong-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states FNG Research Co. Ltd. 1-503 784 Biha-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-825 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOO, Young Sam 101-2001 Kumho Eoullim Apt. 3366 Bokdae-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-805 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jeong Tae 107-1404 (Ahyeon-dong, Gongduk Xi Apartment) 16, Mapo-daero 24-gil, Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | [2016/44] |
Former [2015/45] | 01 /
GOO, Young Sam 101-2001 Kumho Eoullim Apt. 3366 Bokdae-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-805 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Jeong Tae 304-905 Olympic Seonsuchon Apt. 89 Oryun-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-220 / KR | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 13866522.9 | 27.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013KR12351 | Priority number, date | KR20120158630 | 31.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120158630 | [2015/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014104844 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2939660 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2939660 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K47/26, A61K31/047, A61K31/4045, A61K31/445, A61K31/519, A61K31/138, A61K31/4178, A61K31/53, A61K45/06 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K31/047 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/30 (KR);
A61K9/16 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2015/45] | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K47/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROGRANULÄRE FORMULIERUNG MIT AGGLOMERATE MIT DISKONTINUIERLICHER PHASE UND KONTINUIERLICHER PHASE | [2024/18] | English: | MICROGRANULAR FORMULATION INCLUDING AGGLOMERATE UNITS COMPRISING DISCONTINUOUS PHASE AND CONTINUOUS PHASE | [2024/18] | French: | FORMULATION MICROGRANULAIRE COMPRENANT DES UNITÉS AGGLOMÉRÉES COMPRENANT UNE PHASE DISCONTINUE ET UNE PHASE CONTINUE | [2024/18] |
Former [2015/45] | MIKROGRANULÄRE FORMULIERUNG MIT KOAGULATIONSEINHEIT MIT DISKONTINUIERLICHER PHASE UND KONTINUIERLICHER PHASE | ||
Former [2015/45] | MICROGRANULAR FORMULATION INCLUDING COAGULATION UNIT COMPRISING DISCONTINUOUS PHASE AND CONTINUOUS PHASE | ||
Former [2015/45] | FORMULATION MICROGRANULAIRE COMPRENANT UNE UNITÉ DE COAGULATION COMPRENANT UNE PHASE DISCONTINUE ET UNE PHASE CONTINUE | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2015 | Translation filed | 14.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 31.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5837285 (NAKAMICHI KOUICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US6287596 (MURAKAMI TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [X]US2002071865 (KAJIYAMA ATUSHI [JP], et al) | International search | [X]KR20060129106 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]); | [A]JP2011063627 (KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD); | [A]US2012237602 (IKEDA YUKI [JP], et al); | Examination | JPH11116466 |