Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101937521B | Global Dossier | 10.01.2019 | B1 | KR20150099834 | 01.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213727150 | 26.12.2012 | WO2013US61242 | 23.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6298475B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2018 | B2 | JP2016507816 | 10.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213727150 | 26.12.2012 | WO2013US61242 | 23.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105009091B | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | B | CN105009091 | 28.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213727150 | 26.12.2012 | WO2013US61242 | 23.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2939119 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2018 | B1 | EP2939119 | 05.10.2016 | A4 | EP2939119 | 04.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213727150 | 26.12.2012 | WO2013US61242 | 23.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1216046 | 07.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213727150 | 26.12.2012 | WO2013US61242 | 23.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014105228 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213727150 | 26.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9141532 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2015 | B2 | US2014181369 | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213727150 | 26.12.2012 |