Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10172354 | ![]() | 08.01.2019 | B2 | |
US2014187587 | 03.07.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201314141644 | 27.12.2013 | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102148190B | ![]() | 26.08.2020 | B1 | |
KR20150100865 | 02.09.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP6352302B | ![]() | 04.07.2018 | B2 | |
JP2016505606 | 25.02.2016 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
IL239560 | ![]() | 31.05.2020 | B | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CN104883884B | ![]() | 23.03.2018 | B | |
CN104883884 | 02.09.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CA2894515 | ![]() | 19.10.2021 | C | |
CA2894515 | 03.07.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AU2013370491B | ![]() | 06.10.2016 | B2 | |
AU2013370491 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2938191 | ![]() | 31.01.2018 | B1 | |
EP2938191 | 27.07.2016 | A4 | ||
EP2938191 | 04.11.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
BR112015015351 | 23.08.2022 | B8 | ||
BR112015015351 | 16.06.2020 | B1 | ||
BR112015015351 | 11.07.2017 | A2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CR20150304 | 24.08.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
DK2938191T | 07.05.2018 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ES2666144T | 03.05.2018 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
HK1215356 | 26.08.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
LT2938191T | 10.05.2018 | T | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
MX378259 | 10.03.2025 | B | ||
MX2015008442 | 23.09.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
NZ708979 | 31.01.2020 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PH12015501475 | 01.02.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PL2938191T | 31.07.2018 | T3 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
EP13867094 | 23.12.2013 | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
RU2650402 | 11.04.2018 | C2 | ||
RU2015131103 | 31.01.2017 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
UA114661 | 10.07.2017 | C2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ZA201504334 | 28.09.2016 | B | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
WO2013US77537 | 23.12.2013 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2014105842 | ![]() | 03.07.2014 | A1 | |
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
AR094305 | 22.07.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
CL2015001841 | 02.10.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
ECSP15032758 | 30.11.2015 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
HUE038806T | 28.11.2018 | T2 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
PT2938191T | 09.05.2018 | T | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
TWI586275B | 11.06.2017 | B | ||
TW201427597 | 16.07.2014 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
TWI660671B | 01.06.2019 | B | ||
TW201725987 | 01.08.2017 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
UY35247 | 31.07.2014 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201261747094 | 28.12.2012 |