EP2938872 - BLADE UNDERROOT SPACER WITH HOOK REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURDOCK, James R. 25 Maplewood Drive Tolland, Connecticut 06084 / US | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2015/45] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13867313.2 | 18.02.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013US26561 | Priority number, date | US201261746164P | 27.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261746164 P | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014105104 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938872 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2938872 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02K3/04, F01D5/30 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D5/3092 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/70 (EP,US);
F05D2300/43 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4932 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHAUFELUNTERFUSSABSTANDSHALTER MIT HAKENENTFERNUNG | [2015/45] | English: | BLADE UNDERROOT SPACER WITH HOOK REMOVAL | [2015/45] | French: | ENTRETOISE DE PIEDS DE PALE AVEC DÉSENGAGEMENT DE CROCHET | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2013 | AL | 30.01.2019 | AT | 30.01.2019 | CY | 30.01.2019 | CZ | 30.01.2019 | DK | 30.01.2019 | EE | 30.01.2019 | ES | 30.01.2019 | FI | 30.01.2019 | HR | 30.01.2019 | IT | 30.01.2019 | LT | 30.01.2019 | LV | 30.01.2019 | MC | 30.01.2019 | MK | 30.01.2019 | NL | 30.01.2019 | PL | 30.01.2019 | RO | 30.01.2019 | RS | 30.01.2019 | SE | 30.01.2019 | SI | 30.01.2019 | SK | 30.01.2019 | SM | 30.01.2019 | TR | 30.01.2019 | IE | 18.02.2019 | LU | 18.02.2019 | MT | 18.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | BG | 30.04.2019 | NO | 30.04.2019 | GR | 01.05.2019 | IS | 30.05.2019 | PT | 30.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.02.2013 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
IE | 18.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 30.01.2019 | |
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1209322 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,6,8,13 * paragraph [0037]; figure 12 * [Y] 2,11; | [Y]US2007253822 (BUISSON HERVE MARC PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [Y] 2,11* paragraphs [0010] , [0027] *; | [XY]EP2395200 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9,10,12,13 * paragraph [0012]; figures 2,5 * [Y] 2,11 | International search | [A]US6481971 (FORRESTER JAMES MICHAEL [US]); | [A]US6582195 (DAVIDSON DWIGHT ERIC [US]); | [A]US2009004017 (BELMONTE OLIVIER [FR], et al); | [A]US2009252611 (TIPTON THOMAS R [US], et al); | [A]US7824157 (BUISSON HERVE MARC PHILIPPE [FR], et al) | by applicant | EP1209322 | US2007253822 | EP2395200 |