EP2940157 - WATER-BASED COOLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA Mayu 24-4 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | 02 /
GOTO Masahisa 24-4 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | 03 /
ICHITANI Katsumi 24-4 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | 04 /
NOGUCHI Kenro 24-4 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 13867576.4 | 10.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013JP83055 | Priority number, date | JP20120286247 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012286247 | [2015/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014103697 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2940157 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/60, C10M103/00, C10M103/06, C10M133/38, C10M173/02, C10N10/12, C10N30/00, C10N30/12, C10N40/20, C10N40/22, C10M141/08 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
C10M103/00 (US);
C10M125/10 (US);
C10M125/24 (US);
C10M125/26 (US);
C10M133/42 (US);
C10M135/28 (US);
C10M135/36 (US);
C10M141/08 (US);
C21D1/58 (EP,US);
C21D1/60 (EP,US);
C10M2201/043 (EP,US);
C10M2201/062 (EP,US);
C10M2201/081 (EP,US);
C10M2201/082 (EP,US);
C10M2201/085 (EP,US);
C10M2201/087 (EP,US);
C10M2207/122 (EP,US);
C10M2215/222 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,US);
C10M2215/224 (EP,US);
C10M2219/09 (EP,US);
C10M2219/104 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2030/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | C21D1/60, C10M103/00, C10M103/06, C10M133/38, C10M173/02, C10N10/12, C10N30/00, C10N30/12, C10N40/20, C10N40/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGES KÜHLMITTEL | [2015/45] | English: | WATER-BASED COOLANT | [2015/45] | French: | FLUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT À BASE D'EAU | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2015 | Translation filed | 26.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 20.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2008189806 (SHOWA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]JP2002265973 (DAIDO CHEM IND CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] *; | [X]US2008035880 (EGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0025] , [0036] - paragraph [0037] * | International search | [Y]JPS59229496 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH01259119 (SERVIMETAL); | [Y]JPH09227932 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [Y]JP2002265973 (DAIDO CHEM IND CO LTD); | [XP]WO2013129467 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS6442521 | JPH01259119 | - "Yaki-ware wo kangaeru", Quenching Treatment, (196706), pages 140 - 144 |