EP2940415 - COOLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA Hiroshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO Tsuyoshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
ISEMURA Masakazu c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO Nobuyuki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13868439.4 | 26.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013JP84918 | Priority number, date | JP20120285231 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012285231 | [2015/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014104204 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2940415 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F28D15/02, H05K7/20, F28F1/12 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
H05K7/20936 (EP);
F28D15/0275 (EP);
F28F1/12 (EP);
F28D2015/0216 (EP);
H01L23/3677 (EP);
H01L23/427 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | F28D15/02, H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2015/45] | English: | COOLING DEVICE | [2015/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2015 | Translation filed | 30.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2469996 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2290681 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]JP2011259536 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JPH11251499 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JP2011233562 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | JPH10223814 [ ] | [Y]JP2004254387 (HITACHI, LTD.) | [Y]JP2012160669 (THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) | [A]JP2000161880 (TOSHIBA CORP.) | JPH09119785 [ ] (THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) | [A]JP2012138439 (HITACHI, LTD.) | [A]US2008314556 (SHI-WEN ZHOU) | [A]US2007254584 (CHUN PO CHANG) |