EP2938267 - LAYOUT AND METHOD OF SINGULATING MINIATURE ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volcano Corporation 3661 Valley Centre Dr., Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICE, Cheryl 8919 Allenbrook Way San Diego, California 92129 / US | 02 /
XI, Dongjuan Chris 2145 Island Shore Way San Marcus, California 92078 / US | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13868830.4 | 23.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013US77507 | Priority number, date | US201261747506P | 31.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261747506 P | US201314105902 | 13.12.2013 Original published format: US201314105902 | US201314106899 | 16.12.2013 Original published format: US201314106899 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014105835 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938267 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/09, H01L41/193, H01L41/338, B06B1/06 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
B06B1/0685 (EP,US);
H10N30/082 (US);
B06B1/0651 (EP,US);
H10N30/088 (EP,US);
H10N30/2048 (EP,US);
H10N30/857 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | A61B8/12, H04R17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VEREINZELN MINIATURISIERTER ULTRASCHALLWANDLER | [2015/45] | English: | LAYOUT AND METHOD OF SINGULATING MINIATURE ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCERS | [2015/45] | French: | CONFIGURATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE TRANSDUCTEURS ULTRASONORES MINIATURES | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5488954 (SLEVA MICHAEL Z [US], et al); | [X]US2004189152 (KASHIWAYA TOSHIKATSU [JP]); | [A]US2004190377 (LEWANDOWSKI ROBERT STEPHEN [US], et al); | [X]US2006108897 (NANATAKI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US5488954 (SLEVA MICHAEL Z [US], et al); | [Y]US6200269 (LIN GREGORY SHARAT [US], et al); | [Y]US2002077551 (FLEISCHMAN AARON J [US], et al); | [A]JP2005110116 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JP2012199389 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |