EP2940951 - BANDWIDTH ALLOCATION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Dengyuan ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 13868874.2 | 13.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013CN89419 | Priority number, date | CN201210574894 | 26.12.2012 Original published format: CN201210574894 | [2015/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014101675 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2940951 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/917, H04L12/927, H04L12/867, H04L12/911, H04L12/869 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
H04L47/60 (EP,US);
H04L41/0896 (US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L47/629 (EP,US);
H04L47/782 (EP,US);
H04L47/805 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | H04L12/917, H04L12/927 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | BANDBREITENZUWEISUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM | [2015/45] | English: | BANDWIDTH ALLOCATION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2015/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ALLOCATION DE BANDE PASSANTE | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2015 | Translation filed | 24.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 22.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2434803 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] ** figures 1,2 *; | [XI] - ABHISHEK CHANDRA ET AL, "Hierarchical Scheduling for Symmetric Multiprocessors", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20080301), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1045-9219, pages 418 - 431, XP011195642 [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraph [02.2] * * figure 1 * [I] 5,10 | [I] - MINAMI K ET AL, "Design of buffer controller for flow-based high quality communications", GLOBECOM'03. 2003 - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, DEC. 1 - 5, 2003; [IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031201), vol. 6, doi:10.1109/GLOCOM.2003.1258836, ISBN 978-0-7803-7974-9, pages 3248 - 3252, XP010678395 [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [II.B] , [ II.D]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2003.1258836 | International search | [A]EP0753979 (IBM [US]); | [X]CN101523372 (NAT ICT AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]); | [A]CN101667974 (ZTE CORP); | [XP]CN103067308 (ZTE CORP) |