EP2938992 - SCALABLE VEHICLE MODELS FOR INDOOR TIRE TESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC 535 Marriott Drive Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STALNAKER, David O. 2599 Smith-Kramer Street Hartville, Ohio 44632 / US | 02 /
XIE, Ke Jun 694 Brentwood Blvd. Copley, Ohio 44321 / US | 03 /
KNUTH, Erik F. 6072 Independence Drive Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | 04 /
TURNER, John L. 7906 N. Roundstone Drive Tucson, Arizona 85741 / US | 05 /
NEUGEBAUER, Paul M. 3613 Peninsula Drive Akron, Ohio 44319 / US | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 13869688.5 | 10.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013US73969 | Priority number, date | US201261746913P | 28.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261746913 P | US201314043948 | 02.10.2013 Original published format: US201314043948 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014105409 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938992 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/02, B60C19/00 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
G01M17/02 (EP,US);
G06F30/15 (EP,US);
G06F30/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE FAHRZEUGMODELLE FÜR REIFENPRÜFUNG IN INNENRÄUMEN | [2015/45] | English: | SCALABLE VEHICLE MODELS FOR INDOOR TIRE TESTING | [2015/45] | French: | MODÈLES DE VÉHICULES ADAPTABLES POUR RÉALISATION DE TESTS DE PNEUMATIQUES EN INTÉRIEUR | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 23.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP1892637 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-13,15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0054] , [0059] - [0063] - [0072] , [0110] - [0111]; figure 3 * [Y] 14; | [Y]WO2008137363 (MTS SYSTEM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 14 * page 3, lines 17-30 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]WO2006044407 (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE NORTH AM [US], et al); | [A]WO02058947 (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE NORTH AM [US]); | [A]EP0794419 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [A]EP1297975 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [A]US2012245859 (GERARDIN OLIVIER [US], et al) |