EP2947886 - CONTENT SERVER AND CONTENT DISTRIBUTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRABAYASHI, Mitsuhiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
IGARASHI, Tatsuya c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGISHI, Yasuaki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13871939.8 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/48] | WO2013JP80262 | Priority number, date | JP20130007888 | 18.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013007888 | [2015/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014112186 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947886 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/231, H04N21/2343, H04N21/2662, H04N21/442 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
H04N21/23439 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/06 (US);
H04N21/26258 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,CN,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | H04N21/231, H04N21/2343, H04N21/2662 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | INHALTSSERVER UND INHALTSVERTEILUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/48] | English: | CONTENT SERVER AND CONTENT DISTRIBUTION METHOD | [2015/48] | French: | SERVEUR DE CONTENU ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2015 | Translation filed | 08.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012233345 (HANNUKSELA MISKA MATIAS [FI]) [I] 1-8 * figures 1,7,8 * * page 21, paragraphs 90,137 *; | [I] - SHAOBO ZHANG ET AL, "In Band Signalling for Quality Driven Adaptation", 103. MPEG MEETING; 21-1-2013 - 25-1-2013; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20130117), no. m28168, XP030056715 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2011038028 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [X] - ADZIC, V. ET AL., "Optimized adaptive HTTP streaming for mobile devices", PROC. OF SPIE, vol. 8135, (2011), pages 81350T-1 - 81350T- 10., URL: http://proceedings.spiedigitallibrary.org/data/Conferences/SPIEP/62732/81350T_1.pdf, (20131120), XP060021110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.895546 | [X] - TRUONG CONG THANG ET AL., "Adaptive Streaming of Audiovisual Content using MPEG DASH", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (201202), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 78 - 85, XP011434215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2012.6170058 | [Y] - WOO-SHIK KIM, "New Video Quality Metrics in the H.264 reference software", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG 16 Q.6, (2008), URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JVT-SITE/2008_07_HANNOVER/JVT-AB031.ZIP, (20131121), XP030007417 | [A] - STOCKHAMMER, T., "MPEG's Dynamic Adaptive Streaming over HTTP(DASH)-An Enabling Standard for Internet TV", (20110928), pages 8 - 10 , 19, URL: http://www.w3.org/2011/09/webtv/slides/W3C-Workshop.pdf, (20131120), XP055259376 | [A] - "Information technology - Dynamic adaptive streaming over HTTP (DASH) - Part 1: Media presentation description and segment formats (ISO/IEC DIS 23009-1 STD Version 2.1c2", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), (20110830), pages 6 - 11 , 73, 74, URL: HTTP://WWW.3GPP.ORG/FTP/INBOX/LSS_FROM_EXTERNAL_BODIES/ISO_IEC_JTC1_SG29_WG11/29N12313.ZIP, (20131120), XP055265118 |