EP2937020 - CHAIR FOOTREST FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Henglin Chair Industry Co., Ltd. Yang Guang Industrial Park District 3 Anji Huzhou Zhejiang 313300 / CN | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jianglin Yang Guang Industrial Park 3 District Anji Huzhou Zhejiang 313300 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Zhengxing Yang Guang Industrial Park 3 District Anji Huzhou Zhejiang 313300 / CN | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13874664.9 | 11.09.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013CN83292 | Priority number, date | CN20132071075U | 07.02.2013 Original published format: CN 201320071075 U | [2015/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014121609 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937020 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937020 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/50 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
A47C7/5066 (EP,US);
A47C7/5062 (EP,US);
A47C7/506 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSSSTÜTZRAHMEN FÜR EINEN STUHL | [2015/44] | English: | CHAIR FOOTREST FRAME | [2015/44] | French: | CADRE POUR REPOSE-PIED DE FAUTEUIL | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2015 | Translation filed | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 23.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2013 | AL | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | GB | 11.09.2018 | IE | 11.09.2018 | LU | 11.09.2018 | MT | 11.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | FR | 30.09.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.09.2013 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 11.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
MT | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 11.09.2013 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 11.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
MT | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 11.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
MT | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 11.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
MT | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 11.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
MT | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 11.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GB | 11.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.09.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE8019711U (KERSTHOLT, FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, line 3; figures 1-3 * [Y] 9; | [XY]DE3027808 (KERSTHOLT FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 3; figures 1-9 * [Y] 9; | [XY]JP2002282088 (JOHNSON CONTR AUTOMOTIVE SYS) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 9; | [Y]DE202004007416U (REPOSA POLSTERMOEBELWERK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9* paragraph [0014]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPH09220960 (KANTO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK); | [A]KR20030097171 (KIA MOTORS CORP [KR]); | [X]CN201008456Y (SHAOJUN DENG [CN]); | [A]CN201076221Y (RONGLIN YU [CN]); | [XP]CN203168539U (ZHEJIANG HENGLIN CHAIR IND CO) | by applicant | CN201008456Y |