EP2960808 - SERVER DEVICE, PRIVATE SEARCH PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PRIVATE SEARCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MATSUDA, Nori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Mitsuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Takumi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
HIRANO, Takato c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13875718.2 | 25.02.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013JP54735 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014128958 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2960808 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F21/60, G06F21/62, G09C1/00, H04L9/30 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G06F21/62 (EP,US);
G06F21/72 (US);
G06F21/6245 (EP,US);
G09C1/00 (EP,US);
H04L9/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | G06F17/30, G06F21/60, G06F21/62, G09C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | SERVERVORRICHTUNG, PRIVATES SUCHPROGRAMM, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND PRIVATES SUCHSYSTEM | [2016/01] | English: | SERVER DEVICE, PRIVATE SEARCH PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PRIVATE SEARCH SYSTEM | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVEUR, PROGRAMME DE RECHERCHE PRIVÉE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET SYSTÈME DE RECHERCHE PRIVÉE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2015 | Translation filed | 06.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 03.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 04.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - DAN BONEH ET AL, "Public Key Encryption with keyword Search", INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH,, (20040325), vol. 20040325:014738, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-24676-3_30, pages 1 - 15, XP061000696 [I] 1-7 * section 3.1 sections 1 and 2 * | [I] - SCHREFL M ET AL, "SemCrypt - Ensuring Privacy of Electronic Documents Through Semantic-Based Encrypted Query Processing", DATA ENGINEERING WORKSHOPS, 2005. 21ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOKYO, JAPAN 05-08 APRIL 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050405), doi:10.1109/ICDE.2005.280, ISBN 978-0-7695-2657-7, pages 1191 - 1191, XP010924094 [I] 1-7 * sections 4 and 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2005.280 | [A] - ZHIQIANG YANG ET AL, Privacy-Preserving Queries on Encrypted Data, COMPUTER SECURITY - ESORICS 2006. 11TH EUROPEAN SYMPOSIUM ON RESEARCH IN COMPUTER SECURITY (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL. 4189) SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY,, PAGE(S) 479 - 495, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-44601-9, XP019043217 [A] 1-7 * sections 2.2, 3.2 and 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11863908_29 | International search | [A]JP2002044072 (CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS INC); | [A]JP2011198079 (HITACHI SOLUTIONS LTD); | [A]JP2012083863 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2012164031 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A] - TAKANORI SUGA ET AL., "Security of Searchable Encryption Revisited", CSS2011 COMPUTER SECURITY SYMPOSIUM 2011 RONBUNSHU HEISAI ANTI MALWARE ENGINEERING WORKSHOP 2011, IPSJ SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (20111012), vol. 2011, no. 3, pages 125 - 130, XP008180432 | by applicant | JP2011198079 |