EP2962249 - ROAD REGION DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Wenming Research Center for Learning Science Southeast University No. 2 Sipailou Nanjing Jiangsu 210096 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Haitian Research Center for Learning Science Southeast University No. 2 Sipailou Nanjing Jiangsu 210096 / CN | 03 /
RUAN, Zongcai Research Center for Learning Science Southeast University No. 2 Sipailou Nanjing Jiangsu 210096 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yankun 26-27 Innov Tower Block A No. 1801 Hongmei Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200233 / CN | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Bertsch, Florian Oliver Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 13876448.5 | 01.03.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013CN72054 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014131193 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2962249 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T7/20 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
G06T7/215 (EP,US);
G06V20/588 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20164 (US);
G06T2207/30244 (US);
G06T2207/30256 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | STRASSENBEREICHSERKENNUNG | [2016/01] | English: | ROAD REGION DETECTION | [2016/01] | French: | DÉTECTION DE RÉGION DE ROUTE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 08.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.02.2020 | 10.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 27.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010246901 (YANG CHANGHUI [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I] - ARRÓSPIDE J ET AL, "Homography-based ground plane detection using a single on-board camera", IET INTELLIGENT TRANSPORT SYSTEMS,, (20100604), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1049/IET-ITS:20090073, ISSN 1751-9578, pages 149 - 160, XP006035036 [I] 1-15 * Title * * 2 Overview * * equation 1 * * 3 Ground plane estimation;; figure 4 * * 3.3 Ground plane region detection * * 3.1 Homography estimation framework * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/IET-ITS:20090073 | [A] - JIN ZHOU ET AL, "Homography-based ground detection for a mobile robot platform using a single camera", 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA) : ORLANDO, FLORIDA, 15 - 19 MAY 2006, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20060515), ISBN 978-0-7803-9505-3, pages 4100 - 4105, XP010921894 [A] 1-15 * III. Homography based ground detection * | International search | [A]JP2003044996 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2006268076 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]WO2007017693 (TRW LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]CN101441076 (NEUSOFT CORP [CN]); | [Y]CN101868812 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]CN101930609 (NEUSOFT CORP); | [A]US8155380 (MA GUANGLIN [CN], et al) |