EP2965811 - REFORMING CATALYST FOR HYDROCARBON COMPOUNDS, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaka Gas Co., Ltd. 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAMI Susumu c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 02 /
OHTSUKA Hirofumi c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 03 /
HIRANO Takenori 1474 Takaonomachiokubo Izumi-shi Kagoshima 899-0401 / JP | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 13876848.6 | 28.05.2013 | [2016/02] | WO2013JP64770 | Priority number, date | JP20130045847 | 07.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013045847 | [2016/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014136279 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2965811 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/46, B01J23/63, B01J37/16, B01J37/03, B01J35/00, B01J37/02, B01J37/08, // C01B3/40 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
B01J23/46 (EP,US);
B01J23/468 (US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (US);
C01B3/40 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
B01J37/035 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0244 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0261 (US);
C01B2203/1064 (EP,US);
C01B2203/107 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1082 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
C01B2203/142 (US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3725, B01J2523/827, B01J2523/828 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/02] | B01J23/46, B01J23/63, B01J37/16, C01B3/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Title | German: | REFORMIERUNGSKATALYSATOR FÜR KOHLENWASSERSTOFFVERBINDUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/02] | English: | REFORMING CATALYST FOR HYDROCARBON COMPOUNDS, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2016/02] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE REFORMAGE POUR COMPOSÉS HYDROCARBURES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2015 | Translation filed | 24.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 28.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US4693882 (SETZER HERBERT J [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10 * example 2 * [A] 9 [Y] 6-8; | [X]US4812435 (BAIRD JR WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1,3 * compound A *; | [YA]EP1380341 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [Y] 6-8 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 25] , [0 51] *[A] 9; | [XI]US2004013591 (OHTSUKA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * examples 4, 6-7 * * example comp. 3 * [I] 6,8,9 | International search | [A]JPH0398644 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [X]JPH0751576 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [A]JPH07132232 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [X]WO0240152 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO02078840 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004507425 (ENGELHARD CORP.); | [XE]JP2013136047 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD); | [A] - NAKAGAWA, K. ET AL., "Effect of support on the conversion of methane to synthesis gas over supported iridium catalysts", CATALYSIS LETTERS, vol. 51, no. 3-4, pages 163 - 167, XP000774601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019065824331 | by applicant | JPS62262746 | JP2004082033 | JP2007054721 | JP2007532305 |