EP2899250 - LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA Joji c/o DIC Corporation Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | 02 /
NEGISHI Makoto c/o DIC Corporation Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | 03 /
IWASHITA Yoshinori c/o DIC Corporation Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 13876988.0 | 06.03.2013 | [2017/43] | WO2013JP56114 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014136216 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899250 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2899250 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/42, C09K19/12, C09K19/20, C09K19/30, C09K19/34, G02F1/13, C09K19/44, G02F1/1339, C09K19/04 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C09K19/20 (EP,US);
C09K19/0216 (US);
C09K19/3066 (EP);
C09K19/44 (EP,US);
G02F1/13 (US);
G02F1/133 (US);
C09K2019/0466 (EP,US);
C09K2019/123 (EP,US);
C09K2019/124 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3004 (EP,US);
C09K2019/301 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3015 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3016 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3019 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | C09K19/42, C09K19/12, C09K19/20, C09K19/30, C09K19/34, G02F1/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEELEMENT DAMIT | [2015/31] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT USING SAME | [2015/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET ÉLÉMENT D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES L'UTILISANT | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2015 | Translation filed | 23.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2013 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | GB | 06.03.2018 | IE | 06.03.2018 | LU | 06.03.2018 | MT | 06.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | FR | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.03.2013 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 06.03.2013 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
MT | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FR | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.03.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012044453 (MIYAIRI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * items 8 to 12;; examples 5,6; compounds (5-5) *; | [A]EP2085454 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0066]; examples 1-4 * | International search | [X]JP2012117062 (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | [X]JP2013001725 (JNC CORP, et al); | [X]JP2012121964 (JNC CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2008037918 | JP2008038018 | JP2010275390 | JP2011052120 |