EP2975776 - TRAIN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATSUMI, Shogo c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
ASAI, Yosuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
HONDA, Shingo c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
ISHIMARU, Yusuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
IDO, Joji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 13878228.9 | 11.03.2013 | [2016/03] | WO2013JP56633 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014141361 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975776 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/74, H04L12/28, H04L12/40, H04L12/24, G06F11/18 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
H04L12/40182 (EP,US);
H04L41/0654 (US);
H04B1/74 (EP,US);
H04L41/0668 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40293 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H04B1/74, H04L12/28, H04L12/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZUGAUSKUNFT | [2016/03] | English: | TRAIN INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE TRAIN | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2015 | Translation filed | 15.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 07.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004103113 (SATO YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]JP2004172943 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2005159604 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2006197114 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2008295210 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2012105164 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP2004172943 |