EP2955891 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING INTERLEAVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LV, Yongxia Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13878366.7 | 11.03.2013 | [2015/51] | WO2013CN72393 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014139071 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955891 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L1/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04L1/0071 (EP,CN,US);
H04W74/004 (US);
H04L1/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES VERSCHACHTELERS | [2015/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING INTERLEAVER | [2015/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'ENTRELACEUR | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2015 | Translation filed | 10.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 05.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1432261 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8,12-14 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0067] *; | [XI]WO2012165424 (KDDI CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,12-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0050] * [I] 5,6,10,11,16,17; | [E]JP2013123158 (KDDI CORP) [E] 1,2,7,8,12-14* paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] *; | EP2717478 [ ] (KDDI CORP [JP]) | International search | [X]CN1714513 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT]); | [A]CN101438501 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |