EP2929656 - SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING ACCESS TO THE INTERNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Al Amri, Moosa Eisa Al Reem Tower Maktoum Street,Suite 302-303 P.O. Box 14427 Dubai / AE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13879319.5 | 03.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013IB60590 | Priority number, date | AE12432012 | 04.12.2012 Original published format: AE 12432012 | WO2013IB56211 | 29.07.2013 Original published format: PCT/IB2013/056211 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014027338 | Date: | 20.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2929656 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04M11/06, H04L29/06 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04L12/2863 (EP,US);
H04L12/2898 (EP,US);
H04L49/15 (US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | H04L12/28, H04M11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF DAS INTERNET | [2015/42] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING ACCESS TO THE INTERNET | [2015/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'ACCÈS À L'INTERNET | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 02.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 08.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US7337219 (MEENAN PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1,12 * * column 1, paragraphs 48-53 * * column 2, lines 28-67 * * column 3, lines 1-5 * * column 4, paragraphs 42-67 * * column 6, lines 22-65 * * column 20, lines 14-21 * * column 21, line 35 - column 25, line 22 *; | [Y]US2005028012 (AMAMIYA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * figures 10,23 * * paragraphs [0122] - [0124] * | International search | [X]US7337219 (MEENAN PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * Figures; Abstract;Column 2, Line 54 - Column 3, Line 5. *; | [A]US2003055990 (CHELINE DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * Figures; Abstract. *; | [A]US6711138 (PAI PRASAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * Figures; Abstract; Column 2, Lines 10-26; Column 3, Lines 13-33. *; | [A]US2007271329 (HIRAO KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * Figures; Abstract. *; | [A]US2008015973 (ERISMAN TERRY [US]) [A] 1-12 * Figures; Abstract. * |