Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
09.09.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.05.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.04.2019 | First examination report | |
01.04.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.03.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.03.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.10.2016 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
07.10.2016 | Change - classification | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
07.10.2016 | Change - classification | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
03.06.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
20.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.03.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.03.2016 | Change - inventor | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
01.01.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
01.01.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
09.10.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.09.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.09.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.09.2015 | Change - representative | |
04.09.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |