EP2979239 - UNIFYING CLOUD SERVICES FOR ONLINE SHARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Colin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
VONSHAK, Itai 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
WINSTON, Stephen 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/14] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
ZHAO, Colin 485 Potrero Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | ||
02 /
VONSHAK, Itai 485 Potrero Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
03 /
WINSTON, Stephen 485 Potrero Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13880545.2 | 28.03.2013 | [2016/05] | WO2013US34508 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014158179 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979239 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/10, G06F15/16, H04L29/08, G06F3/0484 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
H04L67/567 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
H04L67/06 (US);
H04L67/60 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | G06Q50/10, G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | VEREINHEITLICHUNG VON CLOUD-DIENSTEN FÜR GEMEINSAME ONLINE-NUTZUNG | [2016/05] | English: | UNIFYING CLOUD SERVICES FOR ONLINE SHARING | [2016/05] | French: | UNIFICATION DE SERVICES EN NUAGE À DES FINS DE PARTAGE EN LIGNE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 20.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - DANIEL DIAZ-SANCHEZ ET AL, "Media cloud: an open cloud computing middleware for content management", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20110501), vol. 57, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TCE.2011.5955247, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 970 - 978, XP011335739 [Y] 1-15 * page 970, column right, paragraph third * * page 971, column right, paragraph last * * page 973, column left, paragraph second * * page 974, column left, paragraph first; figure 2 * * page 976, column left, paragraph fourth * * page 977, column left, paragraph fifth * * page 974, column right; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2011.5955247 | [Y] - LE DUY NGAN ET AL, "OWL-S Based Semantic Cloud Service Broker", WEB SERVICES (ICWS), 2012 IEEE 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120624), doi:10.1109/ICWS.2012.103, ISBN 978-1-4673-2131-0, pages 560 - 567, XP032217734 [Y] 1-15 * page 560, column left * * page 562, column left, paragraph fourth; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICWS.2012.103 | [A] - CHEN SHAN ET AL, "Inter-cloud operations via NGSON", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20120101), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2012.6122536, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 82 - 89, XP011396938 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 82, paragraph Introduction * * page 83, column right, paragraph NGSON * * page 86 page 87, paragraph Content Delivery for the Inter-Cloud Operations * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2012.6122536 | [A] - Dimitrios Kourtesis ET AL, "Supporting Semantically Enhanced Web Service Discovery for Enterprise Application Integration", Semantic Enterprise Application Integration for Business Processes, IGI Global, (20100101), pages 105 - 130, doi:10.4018/978-1-60566-804-8.ch006, ISBN 978-1-60566-805-5, XP055305983 [A] 1-15 * page 125 - page 126 * * page 107, column right - page 109, column left * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4018/978-1-60566-804-8.ch006 | [A] - J Octavio ET AL, "Agent-based cloud workflow execution", Integrated Computer-Aided Engineering, doi:10.3233/ICA-2012-0387, (20120101), pages 39 - 56, URL: http://octaviogutierrez.net/docs/Gutierrez-JournalPaper-ICAE.pdf, (20160927), XP055305986 [A] 1-15 * page 39, column right, paragraph first * * page 41; figure 1 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3233/ICA-2012-0387 | International search | [Y]KR20100060498 (KT CORP [KR]); | [Y]KR20100137323 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2010332818 (PRAHLAD ANAND [IN], et al); | [A]KR20130020419 (KT CORP [KR]); | [Y]KR20130026609 (FEELINGK CO LTD [KR]) |