EP2979607 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, ENDOSCOPIC DEVICE, PROGRAM AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Yasunori OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/47] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
MORITA, Yasunori c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13880591.6 | 24.09.2013 | [2016/05] | WO2013JP75629 | Priority number, date | JP20130067422 | 27.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013067422 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014155778 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979607 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04, G02B23/24, G06T1/00 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/000095 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (EP,US);
G01B11/14 (US);
G02B23/2484 (EP,US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06T5/00 (US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06T7/246 (EP,US);
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
A61B5/4312 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10101 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20201 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30032 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30096 (EP,US);
G06V2201/032 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ENDOSKOPVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/05] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, ENDOSCOPIC DEVICE, PROGRAM AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2016/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF ENDOSCOPIQUE, PROGRAMME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2015 | Translation filed | 21.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 09.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003088498 (PENTAX CORP) [Y] 1-11* paragraph [0070] *; | [Y]EP2446809 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068] * * claim 13 * | International search | [Y]JP2008278963 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [Y]JP2009071873 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2010068865 (FUJIFILM CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2012010214 (PANASONIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2010068865 |