Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
25.06.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.01.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.01.2018 | First examination report | |
22.09.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.10.2016 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 | Change - classification | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 | Change - classification | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
21.10.2016 | Change - inventor | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
23.09.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.09.2016 | Change - applicant | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
03.06.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
03.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.01.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
01.01.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
02.12.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.10.2015 | Change - representative | |
21.10.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |