EP2982105 - IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu, Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Yeojeong IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
SON, Sanghyeun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
YEOM, Ilsoo IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Eunji IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Younsoo IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13880869.6 | 18.12.2013 | [2016/06] | WO2013KR11806 | Priority number, date | KR20130036042 | 02.04.2013 Original published format: KR 20130036042 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014163279 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982105 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/45, G06F3/048, G06F3/0488 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (KR);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | H04N5/45, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/06] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2016/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 23.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012293433 (YAMAMOTO YUDAI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0154] * * figures 1-2C *; | [Y]EP1847924 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068]; figure 9 *; | [A]EP2169523 (HTC CORP [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figures 4A,4B * | International search | [Y]US2012032901 (KWON YONG-HWAN [KR]); | [Y]US2010093399 (KIM JONG HWAN [KR], et al); | [A]KR20110050248 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20100048297 (SK TELESYS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2009005258 (SHARP KK) |