EP2983459 - CABINET AND CABINET GROUP HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Haihui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Junpeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Lixin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13881470.2 | 30.10.2013 | [2016/06] | WO2013CN86205 | Priority number, date | CN201310117633 | 07.04.2013 Original published format: CN201310117633 | [2016/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014166235 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983459 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2983459 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/00, H05K7/18, H05K5/02, A47B47/00, A47B55/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H05K5/0021 (EP,US);
A47B47/0008 (US);
A47B47/005 (US);
A47B47/0091 (US);
A47B55/00 (US);
H05K7/186 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | H05K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRANK UND SCHRANKGRUPPE DAMIT | [2016/06] | English: | CABINET AND CABINET GROUP HAVING SAME | [2016/06] | French: | ARMOIRE ET GROUPE D'ARMOIRES LA COMPORTANT | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | Translation filed | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 04.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2013 | AL | 19.07.2017 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IE | 30.10.2017 | LU | 30.10.2017 | MT | 30.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.10.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
MT | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.10.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
MT | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 30.10.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
MT | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 30.10.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
MT | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.10.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
MT | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
MT | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
MT | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4123129 (BUTLER MARLOW DOLE) [I] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0448545 (VYNCKIER NV [BE]) [I] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [T]US2012206876 (CHEN MIN WEI [TW]); | [T]US2009273892 (CHENG TA-YANG [TW]); | [T]US2006261015 (BLACKWELL DONALD A [US]) | International search | [A]CN101494965 (SHENZHEN ZEONLINE TELECOM EQUI [CN]); | [X]CN101902891 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN102340967 (HONGFUJIN PREC IND SHENZHEN, et al); | [A]CN202799446U (LIU SHAOYOU, et al) |