EP2984820 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL VIDEO TO THREE-DIMENSIONAL VIDEO CONVERSION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bitanimate, Inc. 5 Centerpointe Drive Suite 400 Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALEKI, Behrooz, A. 5 Centerpointe Drive Suite 400 Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | 02 /
SARKHOSH, Sarvenaz 5 Centerpointe Drive Suite 400 Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13881474.4 | 09.04.2013 | [2016/07] | WO2013US35843 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014168614 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984820 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N13/02, G02B27/22, G06T7/00, G06T7/20 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
G06T7/248 (EP,US);
G06T15/00 (RU);
G06T7/285 (RU);
H04N13/00 (EP);
H04N13/264 (EP);
G06T1/00 (RU);
G06T7/20 (RU);
G06T7/223 (RU);
G06T7/246 (RU);
G06T7/30 (RU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/07] | H04N13/00, G02B27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR UMWANDLUNG ZWEIDIMENSIONALER VIDEOS IN DREIDIMENSIONALE VIDEOS | [2016/07] | English: | TWO-DIMENSIONAL VIDEO TO THREE-DIMENSIONAL VIDEO CONVERSION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2016/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CONVERSION DE VIDÉO BIDIMENSIONNELLE EN VIDÉO TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 08.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2012242794 (PARK MINWOO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,11-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [0044] - [0046] - [0091]; figure 2 * [Y] 6 [I] 2; | [Y] - XIAOQUAN YI ET AL, "Improved Normalized Partial Distortion Search With Dual-Halfway-Stop for Rapid Block Motion Estimation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070801), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TMM.2007.898930, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 995 - 1003, XP011346444 [Y] 6 * sections II.A and II.B;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2007.898930 | International search | [Y]WO9912127 (XENOTECH RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]KR20100127423 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20110120170 (ALTICAST CORP [KR]); | [Y]US2012002279 (JAIN SUNIL K [US]); | [A]KR20130010613 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |