EP2985503 - JOINING STRUCTURE AND JOINING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2019/07] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAHARA, Hiroshi c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50 Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 02 /
SUGITA, Sumio c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50 Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [2019/07] |
Former [2016/07] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13881542.8 | 19.12.2013 | [2016/07] | WO2013JP07482 | Priority number, date | JP20130081470 | 09.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013081470 | [2016/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014167614 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2985503 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2985503 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/14, B21D39/04, F16D1/08, F16D1/072, F16B17/00, B23P11/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
B21D39/04 (EP,CN,US);
F16L13/146 (CN,US);
F16L33/2076 (CN,US);
B23P11/005 (EP,US);
F16D1/072 (EP,US);
F16D1/0858 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/07] | F16L13/14, B21D39/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN DAFÜR | [2016/07] | English: | JOINING STRUCTURE AND JOINING METHOD THEREOF | [2016/07] | French: | STRUCTURE DE JONCTION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE JONCTION | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2015 | Translation filed | 22.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 03.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2013 | AL | 13.02.2019 | AT | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | DK | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | ES | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | IT | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | NL | 13.02.2019 | PL | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SE | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | TR | 13.02.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.12.2013 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 19.12.2013 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 13.02.2019 | |
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.02.2019 | |
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1797691 (WHITNEY MERRILL) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * page 1; figure . * [I] 5; | [XI]US3590464 (WILDI PAUL, et al) [X] 1,2,7 * columns 3,4; figures 1,2 * [I] 3-6,8,9; | [XI]US3642311 (EDGEMOND JOHN W JR) [X] 1,2,6,7 * columns 1-3; figure - * [I] 3-5,8,9; | [XI]US3792603 (ORAIN M) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 2; figure 14 * [I] 5; | [XI]DE202004016655U (MOESSINGER & WOLTER MASCHB GMB [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] * [I] 5; | [A]EP1691124 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0029] , [0030]; figures 2A-C * | International search | [Y]JPS59100174U (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPS59212134 (FUAIAARANSU KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JPH0325360 | JPH11248562 |