EP2984502 - DISTANCE DETERMINATION OF A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEN, Souvik 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
LEE, Jeongkeun 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Vincent Louis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [2016/07] | Application number, filing date | 13881870.3 | 12.04.2013 | [2016/07] | WO2013US36502 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014168637 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984502 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01S11/06, G01S11/02 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
G01S11/06 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W64/003 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | DISTANZBESTIMMUNG EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/07] | English: | DISTANCE DETERMINATION OF A MOBILE DEVICE | [2016/07] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE LA DISTANCE D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 01.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013051255 (ESTEVEZ LEONARDO WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0058] *; | [A]WO2011084063 (AMBIENT HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0018] *; | [A]US2012182144 (RICHARDSON THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0115] * | International search | [A]US2012329477 (HALL ET AL.); | [A]US2011287787 (NAGARAJA ET AL.); | [A]US2008198072 (ELWELL ET AL.); | [A]US2005285793 (SUGAR ET AL.); | [A]US2004012524 (COURONNE ET AL.) |