EP2986132 - ENCAPSULATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific & Industrial Research Organisation ( C.S.I.R.O. ) Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANGUANSRI, Luz 12 Soaring Road Tarneit, Victoria 3029 / AU | 02 /
AUGUSTIN, Mary Ann 2 Calvin Court Wheelers Hill, Victoria 3150 / AU | 03 /
SHEN, Zhiping 9 Burrendong Street Wyndham Vale, Victoria 3024 / AU | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2016/08] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13882079.0 | 12.07.2013 | [2016/08] | WO2013AU00775 | Priority number, date | AU20130901379 | 19.04.2013 Original published format: AU 2013901379 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014169315 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986132 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986132 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/02, A23P10/30, A23D7/06, A23L7/165, A23L33/115, A23D7/01 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A23D7/011 (EP,US);
A23D7/02 (EP,US);
A23D7/06 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L7/165 (EP,US);
A23P10/30 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | A23D7/06, C11B5/00, A23D7/01, A23P10/20, A23L33/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAPSELUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/08] | English: | ENCAPSULATION METHOD | [2016/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENCAPSULATION | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006286205 (FICHTALI JAOUAD [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0017] , [0028] , [0000] , [0038] , [0050] - [0054] - [0071]; examples 1-9; claims 1-120 *; | [X]US2007218125 (HEAD RICHARD [AU], et al) [X] 1-21* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2008026108 (SUBRAMANIAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al); | [X]US2008095907 (AUGUSTIN MARY A [AU], et al); | [X]US2011059164 (HENDRICKSON WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [X]US8048652 (FICHTALI JAOUAD [US], et al); | [X]US2012288533 (LIVNEY YOAV D [IL]) |