EP2991770 - CLASSIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLSmidth A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | For all designated states FLSmidth A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 2500 Valby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDINER, Michael 17 Dianella Place Capalaba, Queensland 4157 / AU | 02 /
ORUPOLD, Taavi 55 Broadway Street Coolloongabba, Queensland 4102 / AU | [2016/10] | Application number, filing date | 13883447.8 | 01.05.2013 | [2016/10] | WO2013IB53426 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014177912 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991770 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B03B5/62 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
B03B5/623 (EP,US);
B01D21/0045 (EP);
B01J8/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | B03B5/62, B01J8/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | KLASSIERER | [2016/10] | English: | CLASSIFIER | [2016/10] | French: | CLASSIFICATEUR | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 23.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 05.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB264129 (THOMAS GRAHAM MARTYN) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 81; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]DE1118712 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 34; figure - * [Y] 2; | [Y]US5173195 (WRIGHT FRANCIS C [US], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0045959 (UNIV NEWCASTLE RES ASS [AU], et al) [Y] 2* page 11, line 3 - line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]WO2004087326 (UNIV NEWCASTLE RES ASS [AU], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9 * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 7; figure - * [Y] 2 | International search | [A]WO0045959 (UNIV NEWCASTLE RES ASS [AU], et al); | [A]WO2004087326 (UNIV NEWCASTLE RES ASS [AU], et al); | [A]WO2011150455 (NEWCASTLE INNOVATION LTD [AU], et al) |