EP2995058 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS TO SIGNAL AN ACKNOWLEDGEMENT POLICY IN A SHORT FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Minyoung 12694 NW Milazzo Ln Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13884121.8 | 28.12.2013 | [2016/11] | WO2013US78159 | Priority number, date | US201361820512P | 07.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361820512 P | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014182344 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2995058 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/02, H04L1/18, H04L1/00 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H04L1/0079 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1896 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04L45/74 (US);
H04L1/1628 (CN);
H04L1/1864 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/22 (KR,US);
H04L69/324 (KR);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04L69/04 (RU);
H04W28/04 (CN,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/11] | H04L29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN ZUR SIGNALISIERUNG EINER BESTÄTIGUNGSRICHTLINIE BEI KURZEN FRAMES | [2016/11] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS TO SIGNAL AN ACKNOWLEDGEMENT POLICY IN A SHORT FRAME | [2016/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET AGENCEMENTS DE SIGNALISATION D'UNE POLITIQUE D'ACCUSÉ DE RÉCEPTION DANS UNE TRAME COURTE | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2014 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 15.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 11.07.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - YONG LIU (MARVELL), "short-ack ; 11-12-0324-02-00ah-short-ack", IEEE DRAFT; 11-12-0324-02-00AH-SHORT-ACK, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20120314), vol. 802.11ah, no. 2, pages 1 - 15, XP017672405 [X] 1-4,6,8-14 * pages 1,4,5,7 * [Y] 5,7 | [Y] - Pietro Nicoletti, "IEEE 802.11 frame format", (20050601), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://www.studioreti.it/slide/802-11-Frame_E_C.pdf, (20131011), XP055083596 [Y] 5,7 * pages 6,7,21 * | International search | [A]US2006252452 (UMESH ANIL [JP], et al); | [A]US2007116022 (KWON CHANG-YEUL [KR], et al); | [A]US2008133798 (PARK CHAN HO [KR], et al); | [A]EP1959693 (SIEMENS NETWORKS S P A [IT]); | [A]US8027366 (TANG HSIAO-CHENG [US], et al) |