EP3000262 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING INFORMATION FROM A PLURALITY OF MOBILE DEVICES IN AN AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2019/19] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless Singapore Pte. Ltd. 1 Fusionopolis View No. 09-02 Sandcrawler Singapore 138577 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Yang Blk 109 Jurong East Street 13 12-330 600109 Singapore / SG | 02 /
HOO, Shao Pin 113 Jalan Hitam Manis 278515 Singapore / SG | 03 /
CHEOW, Jiesheng, Jason 18 How Sun Close 03-03 538645 Singapore / SG | 04 /
KOH, Choong Yong Blk 308C Anchorvale Road 11-18 543308 Singapore / SG | 05 /
TING, See Ho 6A Flora Drive 07-67 507027 Singapore / SG | [2019/19] |
Former [2016/13] | 01 /
HAN, Yang Blk 109 Jurong East Street 13 12-330 600109 Singapore / SG | ||
02 /
HOO, Shao Pin 113 Jalan Hitam Manis 278515 Singapore / SG | |||
03 /
CHEOW, Jiesheng, Jason 18 How Sun Close 03-03 538645 Singapore / SG | |||
04 /
KOH, Choong Yong Blk 308C Anchorvale Road 11-18 543308 Singapore / SG | |||
05 /
TING, See Ho 6A Flora Drive 07-67 507027 Singapore / SG | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2019/19] |
Former [2016/13] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13885378.3 | 20.05.2013 | [2016/13] | WO2013SG00206 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014189462 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000262 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3000262 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H04W4/02, H04W24/10, H04W84/12, H04W88/02 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
G01S1/00 (US);
G01S5/02526 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W4/043 (EP);
H04W60/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | H04W64/00, H04W4/02, H04W4/04, H04W24/10, H04W84/12, H04W88/02 | ||
Former IPC [2016/13] | H04W64/00, H04W4/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG VON INFORMATIONEN AUF MEHREREN MOBILEN VORRICHTUNGEN IN EINEM GEBIET | [2016/13] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING INFORMATION FROM A PLURALITY OF MOBILE DEVICES IN AN AREA | [2016/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ENREGISTRER DES INFORMATIONS PROVENANT D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE DISPOSITIFS MOBILES DANS UNE ZONE | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 02.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2013 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | IE | 20.05.2019 | LU | 20.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | FR | 08.07.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.05.2013 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.05.2013 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US7389114 (JU WEN-HUA [US], et al) [Y] 10 * column 6, line 14 - line 19 *; | [A]WO2010150031 (ANGYAL ATTILA [HU]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2011028160 (ROEDING CYRIAC [US], et al) [A] 1-13* page 6, paragraph 49 *; | [IY]US2012244875 (CARDONA JAVIER [US], et al) [I] 1-9,11-13 * page 4, paragraph 55 * * page 2, paragraph 33 - page 3 * * page 4, paragraph 52 - paragraph 59 * * page 6, paragraph 102 - paragraph 105 * * page 6, paragraph 90 - paragraph 94 * * page 5, paragraph 82 * * page 5, paragraph 65 * [Y] 10 | International search | [A]EP1016226 (ERICSSON INC [US]); | [A]WO2005091915 (AIRESPACE INC [US]); | [X]EP2518680 (RAPIDBLUE SOLUTIONS OY [FI]); | [A]US2013088982 (JEON HEE-CHUL [KR], et al) | by applicant | US7389114 | US2012244875 |