EP3000019 - APPARATUSES, METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR REMOTE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kongqiao 28-83-5A Wuyi Garden Mu Dan Yuan Tongzhou District Beijing 101117 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yingfei 210-A1208 Wangjinghuayuan Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/11] |
Former [2016/13] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 13885452.6 | 22.05.2013 | [2016/13] | WO2013CN76062 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014186955 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000019 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3000019 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/0484, G06F3/14, G06F3/0346 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/1454 (US);
G06F2203/04806 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME ZUR FERNSTEUERUNG | [2016/13] | English: | APPARATUSES, METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR REMOTE CONTROL | [2016/13] | French: | APPAREILS, PROCÉDÉS ET PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES POUR COMMANDE À DISTANCE | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 24.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2013 | AL | 11.03.2020 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | CZ | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | ES | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | IT | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | NL | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | IE | 22.05.2020 | LU | 22.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | GB | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | DE | 01.12.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.05.2013 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.05.2013 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
DE | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
GB | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010056273 (REVILLE BRENDAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,11,14,15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 9 [I] 4,6,10,12,13; | [X]WO0180180 (SMYLEVENTURES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,11-15 * page 3, line 1 - line 24 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 14 *; | [Y]US2011022965 (LAWRENCE CINDY [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 2,6 *; | [Y] - Wikipedia, "DualShock", (20130411), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=DualShock&oldid=549872014, (20170110), XP055333563 [Y] 9 * page 3 - page 5 * | [Y] - Wikipedia, "AirPlay", (20120326), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=AirPlay&oldid=484084653, (20140523), XP055119821 [Y] 1,2,7-15 * page 1 * * page 4 * | International search | [A]WO2006043977 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al); | [A]CN101523886 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [A]CN101939989 (CISCO TECH INC) | Examination | US2013027404 | by applicant | US2010056273 | WO0180180 |