Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016110032 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP06572 | 07.11.2013 | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10338771 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2016082504 | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | WO2013JP06558 | 07.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2014192049 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2017 | A1 | JP6049874B | 21.12.2016 | B2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP06572 | 07.11.2013 | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2014192048 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2017 | A1 | JP6017029B | 26.10.2016 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | WO2013JP06558 | 07.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3006184 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | A4 | EP3006184 | 13.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP06572 | 07.11.2013 | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105121126B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | B | CN105121126 | 02.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP06572 | 07.11.2013 | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105121125 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | WO2013JP06558 | 07.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3006183 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B1 | EP3006183 | 25.01.2017 | A4 | EP3006183 | 13.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | WO2013JP06558 | 07.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014192049 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014192048 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013114953 | 31.05.2013 |