EP3013025 - MULTIMEDIA DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Jian ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jiaming ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13887067.0 | 17.09.2013 | [2016/17] | WO2013CN83688 | Priority number, date | CN201310250130 | 21.06.2013 Original published format: CN201310250130 | [2016/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014201775 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3013025 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04L29/06, H04N21/233, H04N21/2662 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H04N21/2343 (EP,US);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/75 (EP,US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | H04M11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | MULTIMEDIA-DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2016/17] | English: | MULTIMEDIA DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, AND APPARATUS | [2016/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIAS | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | Translation filed | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 07.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 28.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5611038 (SHAW VENSON M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 23, line 44 - page 24, line 9; claims 1, 2, 3 *; | [A]WO0110136 (INDINELL SA [UY], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 12 - line 31 ** page 29, line 29 - page 33, line 6 *; | [A]US2003174243 (ARBEITER JAMES HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 34 - page 6, paragraph 49 *; | [XA]US2007153827 (LEE JAE-HOON [KR]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * page 1, paragraph 7 * * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 2, paragraph 26; figure 1 * [A] 2-4,7-9 | International search | [A]CN1149795 (KUANG DONGYING [CN]); | [Y]CN1516436 (TENGXUN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY [CN]); | [Y]CN101754025 (INVENTEC SHANGHAI APPLIANCES) |