EP3012967 - METHOD FOR SELECTING OPTIMAL MOVEMENT PATTERN FOR MOTOR AND MOTOR SELECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/17] | METHOD FOR SELECTING OPTIMAL MOVEMENT PATTERN FOR MOTOR, PROGRAM FOR SELECTING OPTIMAL MOVEMENT PATTERN FOR MOTOR, AND MOTOR SELECTION DEVICE | ||
[2020/20] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Shota c/o NSK Ltd. 1-5-50 Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 02 /
MARUYAMA, Masayuki c/o NSK Ltd. 1-5-50 Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13887402.9 | 19.12.2013 | [2016/17] | WO2013JP84167 | Priority number, date | JP20130128948 | 19.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013128948 | JP20130199002 | 25.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013199002 | [2016/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014203430 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3012967 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/20, H02P23/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
H02P23/0004 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (EP,CN,US);
G05B19/19 (US);
G06F17/10 (US);
H02P29/00 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | H02P29/00, G06F17/50, G06Q10/00, G05B19/19, G06F17/10, H02P23/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/17] | H02P29/00, G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES OPTIMALEN BEWEGUNGSMUSTERS FÜR EINEN MOTOR UND MOTORAUSWAHLVORRICHTUNG | [2020/20] | English: | METHOD FOR SELECTING OPTIMAL MOVEMENT PATTERN FOR MOTOR AND MOTOR SELECTION DEVICE | [2020/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE MOTIF DE MOUVEMENT OPTIMAL POUR MOTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION DE MOTEUR | [2020/20] |
Former [2016/17] | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES OPTIMALEN BEWEGUNGSMUSTERS FÜR EINEN MOTOR, PROGRAMM ZUR AUSWAHL OPTIMALER BEWEGUNGSMUSTER FÜR EINEN MOTOR UND MOTORAUSWAHLVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/17] | METHOD FOR SELECTING OPTIMAL MOVEMENT PATTERN FOR MOTOR, PROGRAM FOR SELECTING OPTIMAL MOVEMENT PATTERN FOR MOTOR, AND MOTOR SELECTION DEVICE | ||
Former [2016/17] | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE MOTIF DE MOUVEMENT OPTIMAL POUR MOTEUR, PROGRAMME DE SÉLECTION DE MOTIF DE MOUVEMENT OPTIMAL POUR MOTEUR, ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION DE MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2015 | Translation filed | 09.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 29.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2011166953 (FANUC LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2010228697 (KOMIYA TAKEHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0041]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0067]; figure 11 * | International search | [A]JP2006260350 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2001229210 (NEC CORP); | [A]WO2009075152 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008139800 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2006042589 | JP2003099479 |