EP2988495 - DATA PRESENTATION METHOD, TERMINAL AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAN, Zhihong c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
MU, Chao c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13888027.3 | 28.06.2013 | [2016/08] | WO2013CN78319 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014205761 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988495 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N7/08, H04N21/4722, H04N21/4725, H04N21/858, G11B27/10, G11B27/34 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
H04N21/47217 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N21/26258 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4725 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/6175 (EP,US);
H04N21/6581 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | H04N7/173, H04N7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | DATENDARSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, -ENDGERÄT UND -SYSTEM | [2016/08] | English: | DATA PRESENTATION METHOD, TERMINAL AND SYSTEM | [2016/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, TERMINAL ET SYSTÈME DE PRÉSENTATION DE DONNÉES | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2015 | Translation filed | 20.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008163283 (TAN ANGELITO PEREZ [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * figures 1,3-6 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0027] , [0030] - [0034] - [0047] - [0055] *; | [A]US2009327894 (RAKIB SHLOMO SELIM [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0108] , [0113] - [0117]; figures 10-12 *; | [A]EP1128674 (TOKYO BROADCASTING SYST [JP]) [A] 1-24 * figure 6 *; | [A]US2006117352 (YAMAGATA YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0003] , [0124]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007250901 (MCINTIRE JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0156] , [0239] *; | [A]US2002083469 (JEANNIN SYLVIE [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0015]; figures 3b,7 *; | [A]US2012167145 (INCORVIA ANDREW [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2011137753 (MOEHRLE ARMIN [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0016]; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2012308202 (MURATA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * figures 4,47,48 * | International search | [A]US2003033202 (OGAWA YUKIO [JP], et al); | [Y]CN101448138 (SHENZHEN COSHIP ELECTRONICS CO [CN]); | [Y]CN102737684 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) |