EP3015669 - REDUCING AGENT PYROLYSIS SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doosan Engine Co. Ltd. (Sinchon-dong) 18 Gongdan-ro 21beon-gil Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 51561 / KR | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jae Moon 18, Gongdan-ro 21beon-gil Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do, 51561 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sang Jin 18, Gongdan-ro 21beon-gil Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do, 51561 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Jong Tae 18, Gongdan-ro 21beon-gil Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do, 51561 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Chang Hee 18, Gongdan-ro 21beon-gil Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do, 51561 / KR | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2016/18] | Application number, filing date | 13888429.1 | 06.12.2013 | [2016/18] | WO2013KR11298 | Priority number, date | KR20130075324 | 28.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130075324 | [2016/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014208841 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015669 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3015669 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/24, F01N3/28, B01D53/94, F01N3/20 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
B01D53/9431 (EP,US);
F01N3/24 (KR);
B01D53/94 (KR);
F01N3/2033 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (US);
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
F01N3/28 (KR);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
F01N2240/14 (EP,US);
F01N2240/20 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1453 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | F01N3/24, F01N3/28, B01D53/94 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDUKTIONSMITTELPYROLYSEANLAGE FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN KATALYTISCHEN REDUKTION | [2016/18] | English: | REDUCING AGENT PYROLYSIS SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION APPARATUS | [2016/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PYROLYSE DE RÉDUCTEUR POUR APPAREIL DE RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIF | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2015 | Translation filed | 28.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 21.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE MAN Energy Solutions SE Stadtbachstrasse 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2019/10] | 25.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.07.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.10.2020 | 27.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2020 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 11.12.2020 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2013 | AL | 02.05.2018 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | PT | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | IE | 06.12.2018 | LU | 06.12.2018 | MT | 06.12.2018 | FI | 06.12.2019 | GB | 06.12.2019 | SE | 07.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | NO | 31.12.2019 | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/48] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
FI | 06.12.2019 | ||
GB | 06.12.2019 | ||
SE | 07.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
FI | 06.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
FI | 06.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/32] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.12.2013 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
MT | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2011258987 (MIEBACH ROLF [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 3-6 [I] 2,9; | [A]US2011258989 (HIROTA SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [Y]EP2465602 (PROVENTIA EMISSION CONTROL OY [FI]); | [Y]US2011258987 (MIEBACH ROLF [DE], et al); | [Y]JP2013002337 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]KR20110078454 (HK MNS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2013164182 (IIJIMA TADASHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | KR101236305B | Opposition | DE19913462 | US2009205324 | US2011061374 | KR20110078454 | US2011258987 | US2011258989 | EP2465602 | DE102011106233 | DE102011106243 | DE102011106237 | JP2013002337 | EP2585693 | US2013164182 | EP2628913 |