06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
25.06.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
17.07.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
11.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.07.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.03.2020 |
Change - inventor |
|
19.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
23.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
03.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
03.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
16.09.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
15.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
15.04.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
02.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
05.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|